NV SB310 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Chapter 523.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Chapter 523.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to dentistry; providing for the licensure and regulation of expanded function dental assistants; creating a special endorsement for dental hygienists to practice restorative dental hygiene; authorizing a dental hygienist who possesses certain qualifications to prescribe and dispense certain drugs that are not controlled substances and certain devices; authorizing a public health dental hygienist to authorize an expanded function dental assistant or dental assistant to perform certain tasks under certain circumstances; providing penalties; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Establishes provisions relating to dentistry. (BDR 54-601)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-16 | Senate | Chapter 523. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 680 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2023-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. |
2023-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2023-05-26 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 680.) To printer. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 17, Nays: 4.) To Assembly. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 406.) To printer. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |