NV SB310 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - Chapter 543.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - Chapter 543.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to state financial administration; making an appropriation to the Nevada System of Higher Education and authorizing the disbursement of certain federal money in certain circumstances to enable the College of Southern Nevada to assist and carry out the NV Grow Program; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Makes an appropriation to the Nevada System of Higher Education and authorizes the disbursement of certain federal money in certain circumstances to enable the College of Southern Nevada to assist and carry out the NV Grow Program. (BDR S-570)
Sponsors
Sen. Dina Neal [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-11 | Senate | Chapter 543. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 543. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2021-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 36, Nays: 6.) To Senate. |
2021-05-29 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-29 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2021-05-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. To Assembly. |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To printer. |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 702.) |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Placed on General File. |
2021-05-21 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Taken from General File. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 234.) |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To printer. |