NV SB307 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-01 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 320.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-01 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 320.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to public officers and candidates for public office. (BDR 17-768)
Title
Revises provisions relating to public officers and candidates for public office. (BDR 17-768)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-01 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 320. |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 796 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2015-05-25 | Senate | In Senate. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | Amendment No. 903 not adopted. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. |
2015-05-21 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 796.) To printer. |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2015-04-10 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee. |
2015-04-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Read second time. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer. |