NV SB305 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 242.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions regarding certain proceedings concerning children. (BDR 38-926)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions regarding certain proceedings concerning children. (BDR 38-926)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate Reconsideration (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate Reconsideration (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 242.
2017-05-25SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-05-23SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2017-05-22AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 33, Nays: 8, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2017-05-19AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-05-18AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-05-17AssemblyRead second time.
2017-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2017-04-25AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2017-04-25AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-04-24SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 17, Nays: 4.) To Assembly.
2017-04-24SenateAction of passage reconsidered.
2017-04-24SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 13, Nays: 8.) .
2017-04-24SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2017-04-21SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 156.) To printer.
2017-04-20SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-03-20SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-17SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Nevada State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/history.cfm?ID=688
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/SB/SB305.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/SB/SB305_R1.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/SB/SB305_EN.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=332&fldReprint=1&fldDocTypeCode=SB&fldBillNumber=305&fldBillname=SB305
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=333&fldReprint=1&fldDocTypeCode=SB&fldBillNumber=305&fldBillname=SB305
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=838&fldReprint=1&fldDocTypeCode=SB&fldBillNumber=305&fldBillname=SB305
Roll Callhttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=332&fldReprint=1&fldDocTypeCode=AB&fldBillNumber=48&fldBillname=AB48
Roll Callhttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=333&fldReprint=1&fldDocTypeCode=AB&fldBillNumber=48&fldBillname=AB48
Roll Callhttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=838&fldReprint=1&fldDocTypeCode=AB&fldBillNumber=48&fldBillname=AB48

Bill Comments

feedback