NV SB302 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
Pending: Senate Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides an early start for recreational marijuana sales. (BDR 40-545)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides an early start for recreational marijuana sales. (BDR 40-545)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-01SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
2017-04-28SenateRe-referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To printer.
2017-04-28SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 140.)
2017-04-27SenateFrom committee: Amend, and re-refer to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development.
2017-04-13SenateWaiver granted effective: April 13, 2017.
2017-04-04SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2017-03-20SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-17SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback