NV SB295 | 2021 | 81st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 332.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to industrial insurance; prohibiting the termination or limitation of compensation paid to certain injured employees for a permanent total disability on the basis that the injured employee earns income; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to industrial insurance. (BDR 53-996)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-03SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 332.
2021-06-02SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2021-05-31SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2021-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
2021-05-30AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2021-05-29AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2021-05-28AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2021-05-27AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2021-05-26AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2021-05-25AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2021-05-24AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2021-05-24AssemblyPlaced on General File.
2021-05-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2021-05-20AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.
2021-05-20AssemblyIn Assembly.
2021-05-19SenateRead third time. Passed as amended. Title approved as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2021-05-19SenatePlaced on General File.
2021-05-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended.
2021-04-20SenateExemption effective.
2021-04-20SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
2021-04-19SenateRe-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
2021-04-19SenateTaken from General File.
2021-04-19SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 417.)
2021-04-19SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2021-04-19SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2021-04-19SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2021-03-23SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2021-03-22SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback