NV SB29 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 4.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 4.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to motor vehicles; authorizing the Department of Motor Vehicles to appoint an agent to issue salvage titles; authorizing such an agent to use the name, service marks, trademarks or logo of the Department in an advertisement upon receipt of the Department's written permission for such use; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Authorizes the appointment of an agent of the Department of Motor Vehicles to issue salvage titles. (BDR 43-348)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 4. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2021-03-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2021-03-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-02-23 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To committee. |
2021-02-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Read first time. To committee. |
2020-12-14 | Senate | From printer. |
2020-11-18 | Senate | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To printer. |