NV SB29 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 73.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 73.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the transfer of a criminal case from one justice court or municipal court to another such court or a district court in certain circumstances. (BDR 1-396)
Title
Provides for the transfer of a criminal case from one justice court or municipal court to another such court or a district court in certain circumstances. (BDR 1-396)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-22 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 73. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-04-21 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2017-04-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 133.) To printer. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Read first time. To committee. |
2016-11-23 | Senate | From printer. |
2016-11-16 | Senate | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |