NV SB288 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - Chapter 550.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - Chapter 550.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to transportation; authorizing a monitored autonomous vehicle provider to enter into an agreement with a transportation network company to provide transportation services through the digital network or software application of the company; imposing certain requirements on a transportation network company and monitored autonomous vehicle provider relating to the provision of transportation services by a monitored autonomous vehicle provider; authorizing a transportation network company to charge a fare for such services on behalf of a monitored autonomous vehicle provider; prohibiting a local governmental entity from imposing certain taxes or fees relating to such services; revising provisions relating to transportation network company insurance; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to transportation network companies. (BDR 58-935)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-11 | Senate | Chapter 550. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 721 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | To Senate. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | To printer. |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: 2, Absent: 1.) |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 721.) Dispensed with reprinting. |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To committee. |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | To Assembly. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Printer. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 484.) |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To printer. |