NV SB286 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 588.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions governing the regulation of applied behavior analysis. (BDR 39-633)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions governing the regulation of applied behavior analysis. (BDR 39-633)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-14SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 588.
2017-06-08SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-05SenateAssembly Amendment No. 1152 concurred in. To enrollment.
2017-06-05SenateIn Senate.
2017-06-05AssemblyTo Senate.
2017-06-05AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint .
2017-06-05AssemblyTo printer.
2017-06-05AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 37, Nays: 5.)
2017-06-05AssemblyDispensed with reprinting.
2017-06-05AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1152.)
2017-06-05AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2017-06-05AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-05-23AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
2017-05-23AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-05-23SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint . To Assembly.
2017-05-22SenateTo printer.
2017-05-22SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.)
2017-05-22SenateReprinting dispensed with.
2017-05-22SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 698.)
2017-05-22SenatePlaced on General File.
2017-05-22SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-05-05SenateRe-referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.
2017-05-05SenateFrom committee: Re-refer to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy.
2017-04-25SenateExemption effective.
2017-04-25SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
2017-04-24SenateRe-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
2017-04-24SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 378.)
2017-04-24SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-04-24SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-12SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2017-03-17SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-16SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback