NV SB284 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 88.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to medical conditions; creating the Advisory Task Force on HIV Exposure Modernization; setting forth the duties of the Task Force; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates the Advisory Task Force on HIV Exposure Modernization. (BDR S-742)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 88.
2019-05-14SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-05-10SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2019-05-09AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 37, Nays: 3, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
2019-05-08AssemblyRead second time.
2019-05-07AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-04-17AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
2019-04-17AssemblyIn Assembly.
2019-04-16SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2019-04-16SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-15SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 162.) To printer.
2019-04-10SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-03-18SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2019-03-15SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback