NV SB283 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-13 - Chapter 386.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-13 - Chapter 386.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to health care; requiring a custodian of health care records to furnish health care records electronically under certain circumstances; prohibiting a custodian of health care records from charging a fee that exceeds a certain amount to furnish health care records electronically if the health care records are maintained electronically; authorizing a person to disclose the genetic information of another person in accordance with certain federal law; revising the circumstances under which a physician is authorized to prescribe or recommend and a manufacturer is authorized to provide or make available an investigational drug, biological product or device; authorizing a physician to prescribe or recommend an individualized investigational treatment under certain circumstances; requiring the reporting of certain information concerning individualized investigational treatments and investigational drugs, biological products and devices to certain governmental entities; revising the method by which a collection agency must notify a medical debtor before taking any action to collect a medical debt; authorizing a manufacturer to provide or make available an individualized investigational treatment to a patient under certain circumstances; authorizing the imposition of administrative penalties for certain violations; prohibiting an officer, employee or agent of this State from preventing or attempting to prevent a patient from accessing an individualized investigational treatment; requiring an insurer, third-party administrator or employer to furnish health care records in certain circumstances; prescribing the maximum amount of any fee charged to furnish health care records in those circumstances; providing a penalty; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises certain provisions relating to health care . (BDR 54-555)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-13 | Senate | Chapter 386. |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. |
2023-06-09 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2023-06-08 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint. To enrollment. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | To printer. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Conference report adopted by Assembly. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | From committee: Concur in Assembly Amendment No. 681 and further amend. (Conference Amend. No. CA5.) Conference report adopted by Senate. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | In Senate. |
2023-06-04 | Assembly | Assembly Amendment No. 681 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To Senate. |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 681 not concurred in. To Assembly. |
2023-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. |
2023-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2023-05-26 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 681.) To printer. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-04-20 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. |
2023-04-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 100.) To printer. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |