NV SB28 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires an annual review of certain rates paid by Medicaid in this State. (BDR 38-373)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires an annual review of certain rates paid by Medicaid in this State. (BDR 38-373)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-06Senate(No further action taken.)
2017-02-23SenateExemption effective.
2017-02-23SenateRe-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
2017-02-23SenateFrom committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Committee on Finance.
2017-02-09SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2017-02-06SenateRead first time. To committee.
2016-11-23SenateFrom printer.
2016-11-16SenatePrefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback