NV SB275 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to wildlife; creating the Advisory Guide Board within the Department of Wildlife; authorizing the Department to submit any application for a master guide license or subguide license to the Advisory Guide Board for its recommendations; revising certain additional penalties for purposefully or knowingly acting as a master guide or subguide without a license; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Makes various changes relating to licensing and regulation of master guides and subguides. (BDR 45-150)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-02 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2019-06-02 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To committee. |
2019-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To Assembly. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | To printer. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1074.) |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Placed on General File. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Taken from General File. Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-04-14 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer. |