NV SB267 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - Chapter 525.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - Chapter 525.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to workplace diversity; authorizing the University of Nevada, Las Vegas, to conduct a study concerning diversity and equality in the workplace and to conduct a survey to collect data and information concerning diversity and equality in the workplace from certain business entities and state and local governmental agencies in this State; revising the prospective expiration of an existing survey of businesses conducted by the Secretary of State; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Authorizes the University of Nevada, Las Vegas, to conduct a study concerning diversity and equality in the workplace. (BDR S-461)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-30 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-30 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-11 | Senate | Chapter 525. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 32, Nays: 10.) To Senate. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-05-30 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. |
2021-05-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-05-30 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint. To Assembly. |
2021-05-30 | Senate | To printer. |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 838.) |
2021-05-30 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 820.) To printer. |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Placed on General File. |
2021-05-29 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Taken from General File. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 279.) |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |