NV SB263 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-15 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-15 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to elections; eliminating the requirement to cancel a person's voter registration if a person changes his or her party affiliation; revising provisions related to military and overseas voters; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to elections. (BDR 24-896)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-15 | Assembly | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.) |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee. |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 398.) To printer. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer. |