NV SB262 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 359.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions concerning payments for treatment relating to mental illness or the abuse of alcohol or drugs. (BDR 57-455)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions concerning payments for treatment relating to mental illness or the abuse of alcohol or drugs. (BDR 57-455)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-04SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 359.
2017-05-30SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-05-29SenateAssembly Amendment No. 744 concurred in. To enrollment.
2017-05-26SenateIn Senate.
2017-05-25AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 39, Nays: 1, Excused: 2.) To Senate.
2017-05-25AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
2017-05-24AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 744.) To printer.
2017-05-24AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2017-05-24AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-26AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
2017-04-26AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-04-25SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2017-04-25SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2017-04-24SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 377.) To printer.
2017-04-24SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-04-24SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-03-15SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-14SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback