NV SB260 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 292.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 292.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to Internet privacy; exempting certain persons and information collected about a consumer in this State from requirements imposed on operators, data brokers and covered information; prohibiting a data broker from making any sale of certain information collected about a consumer in this State if so directed by the consumer; revising provisions relating to the sale of certain information collected about a consumer in this State; authorizing an operator or data broker to remedy a failure to comply with certain requirements relating to the collection and sale of certain information about consumers in this State if it is the first failure of the operator or data broker to comply with such requirements; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to Internet privacy. (BDR 52-253)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 292. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 514 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Absent: 1.) To Senate. |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 514.) To printer. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 414.) To printer. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |