NV SB251 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 524.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the Board to Review Claims to adopt regulations for the administration of certain programs to assist operators of petroleum storage tanks. (BDR 40-942)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the Board to Review Claims to adopt regulations for the administration of certain programs to assist operators of petroleum storage tanks. (BDR 40-942)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-09SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 524.
2017-06-07SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-05-30SenateAssembly Amendment No. 834 concurred in. To enrollment.
2017-05-29SenateIn Senate.
2017-05-26AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 36, Nays: 5, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2017-05-26AssemblyPlaced on General File.
2017-05-26AssemblyTaken from Chief Clerk's desk.
2017-05-24AssemblyPlaced on Chief Clerk's desk.
2017-05-24AssemblyTaken from General File.
2017-05-24AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
2017-05-23AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 834.) To printer.
2017-05-22AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-18AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To committee.
2017-04-18AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-04-17SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2017-04-12SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-04-11SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-04-11SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2017-04-10SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 91.) To printer.
2017-04-07SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-03-09SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-08SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback