NV SB250 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Revises the certification requirements for constables in certain townships. (BDR 20-947)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises the certification requirements for constables in certain townships. (BDR 20-947)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-06Assembly(No further action taken.)
2017-05-26AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-05-26SenateAssembly Amendment No. 866 not concurred in. To Assembly.
2017-05-26SenateIn Senate.
2017-05-25AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 12, Excused: 2.) To Senate.
2017-05-25AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
2017-05-24AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 866.) To printer.
2017-05-23AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-05-23AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2017-05-23AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-25AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.
2017-04-25AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-04-24SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 15, Nays: 6.) To Assembly.
2017-04-24SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2017-04-21SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 447.) To printer.
2017-04-21SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-04-21SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-03-09SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-08SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback