NV SB240 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on May 13 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-13 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 77.
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on May 13 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-13 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 77.
Summary
Provides for the evaluation and establishment of the maximum speed on certain portions of State Route 159. (BDR 43-1072)
Title
Provides for the evaluation and establishment of the maximum speed on certain portions of State Route 159. (BDR 43-1072)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-13 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 77. | |
2009-05-11 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-06 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-05 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. | |
2009-05-02 | Read second time. | |
2009-05-01 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-04-14 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee. | |
2009-04-14 | In Assembly. | |
2009-04-13 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-04-09 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-04-08 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 200.) To printer. | |
2009-04-06 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-03-16 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-03-13 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=655 |