NV SB238 | 2015 | 78th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-10 - Vetoed by the Governor. (Return to 2017 Session)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for the submission of a certain advisory question to the voters of the City of Ely. (BDR S-709)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the submission of a certain advisory question to the voters of the City of Ely. (BDR S-709)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-10SenateVetoed by the Governor. (Return to 2017 Session)
2015-05-28SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2015-05-26SenateAssembly Amendment No. 822 concurred in. To enrollment.
2015-05-21SenateIn Senate.
2015-05-20AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 23, Nays: 18, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2015-05-20AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
2015-05-19AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 822.) To printer.
2015-05-18AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2015-04-10AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.
2015-04-10AssemblyIn Assembly.
2015-04-08SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2015-04-08SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2015-04-07SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 196.) To printer.
2015-04-06SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2015-03-11SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2015-03-10SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Nevada State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Reports/history.cfm?ID=542
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Bills/SB/SB238.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Bills/SB/SB238_R1.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Bills/SB/SB238_R2.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Bills/SB/SB238_EN.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=222&fldReprint=1&fldDocTypeCode=SB&fldBillNumber=238&fldBillname=SB238
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=935&fldReprint=2&fldDocTypeCode=SB&fldBillNumber=238&fldBillname=SB238
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=222&fldReprint=1&fldDocTypeCode=AB&fldBillNumber=464&fldBillname=AB464
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=935&fldReprint=2&fldDocTypeCode=AB&fldBillNumber=464&fldBillname=AB464

Bill Comments

feedback