NV SB233 | 2015 | 78th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-10 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 530.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to occupational safety. (BDR 53-990)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to occupational safety. (BDR 53-990)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-10SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 530.
2015-05-29SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2015-05-27SenateAssembly Amendment No. 724 concurred in. To enrollment.
2015-05-25SenateIn Senate.
2015-05-22AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 24, Nays: 17, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2015-05-22AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
2015-05-21AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 724.) To printer.
2015-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2015-04-03AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.
2015-04-03AssemblyIn Assembly.
2015-04-02SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
2015-04-02SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2015-04-01SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 139.) To printer.
2015-03-31SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2015-03-10SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2015-03-09SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback