NV SB232 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-04 - In Senate. To enrollment.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-04 - In Senate. To enrollment.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to Medicaid; requiring the State Plan for Medicaid to include coverage for postpartum care services for a certain period of time following a pregnancy; making appropriations to certain divisions of the Department of Health and Human Services; authorizing expenditures by certain divisions of the Department; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Requires the State Plan for Medicaid to include coverage for postpartum care services. (BDR 38-45)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-29 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-29 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-04 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2023-06-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: 1.) To Senate. |
2023-06-02 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee. |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2023-05-30 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. To Assembly. |
2023-05-29 | Senate | To printer. |
2023-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) |
2023-05-29 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2023-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 766.) |
2023-05-29 | Senate | Placed on General File. |
2023-05-29 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. Exemption effective. To printer. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 63.) Taken from General File. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |