NV SB229 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 599.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to guardianships. (BDR 13-87)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to guardianships. (BDR 13-87)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 599.
2017-06-08SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-05SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2017-06-05AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
2017-06-04AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-06-03AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-06-02AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-06-01AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-05-31AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-05-30AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-05-30AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2017-05-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2017-05-26AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2017-05-26AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-05-26SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint . To Assembly.
2017-05-25SenateTo printer.
2017-05-25SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.)
2017-05-25SenateReprinting dispensed with.
2017-05-25SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 935.)
2017-05-25SenatePlaced on General File.
2017-05-25SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-21SenateExemption effective.
2017-04-21SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
2017-04-20SenateRe-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
2017-04-20SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 432.)
2017-04-20SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-04-20SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-03-17SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2017-03-01SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2017-02-28SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/history.cfm?ID=527
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/SB/SB229.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/SB/SB229_R1.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/SB/SB229_R2.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/SB/SB229_EN.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=183&fldReprint=1&fldDocTypeCode=SB&fldBillNumber=229&fldBillname=SB229
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=1020&fldReprint=2&fldDocTypeCode=SB&fldBillNumber=229&fldBillname=SB229
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=1415&fldReprint=2&fldDocTypeCode=SB&fldBillNumber=229&fldBillname=SB229

Bill Comments

feedback