NV SB224 | 2015 | 78th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-02 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to employment. (BDR 53-985)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to employment. (BDR 53-985)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-02SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 325.
2015-05-29SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2015-05-27SenateAssembly Amendment No. 865 concurred in. To enrollment.
2015-05-25SenateIn Senate.
2015-05-22AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2015-05-22AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
2015-05-21AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 865.) To printer.
2015-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2015-04-17AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.
2015-04-17AssemblyIn Assembly.
2015-04-16SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
2015-04-16SenateDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2015-04-16SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2015-04-16SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 599.) To printer.
2015-04-16SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2015-04-16SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2015-03-09SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2015-03-06SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback