NV SB220 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Chapter 211.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to Internet privacy; prohibiting an operator of an Internet website or online service which collects certain information from consumers in this State from making any sale of certain information about a consumer if so directed by the consumer; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to Internet privacy. (BDR 52-920)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-30SenateChapter 211.
2019-05-29SenateApproved by the Governor.
2019-05-28SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-05-24SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2019-05-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
2019-05-22AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-21AssemblyRead second time.
2019-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-04-25AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.
2019-04-25AssemblyIn Assembly.
2019-04-23SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2019-04-23SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-22SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 549.) To printer.
2019-04-22SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-04-22SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-02-19SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2019-02-18SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback