NV SB212 | 2011 | 76th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-15 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 381.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-15 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 381.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing charter schools. (BDR 34-900)
Title
Revises provisions governing charter schools. (BDR 34-900)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-15 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 381. | |
2011-06-13 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2011-06-06 | Assembly Amendment No. 947 concurred in. To enrollment. | |
2011-06-06 | In Senate. | |
2011-06-06 | To Senate. | |
2011-06-06 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint . | |
2011-06-06 | To printer. | |
2011-06-06 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) | |
2011-06-06 | Dispensed with reprinting. | |
2011-06-06 | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 947.) | |
2011-06-05 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2011-06-05 | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. | |
2011-06-05 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-06-04 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee. | |
2011-06-04 | In Assembly. | |
2011-06-04 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2011-06-04 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint . | |
2011-06-04 | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 876.) To printer. | |
2011-06-04 | Placed on General File. | |
2011-06-04 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-06-01 | To committee. | |
2011-06-01 | From committee: Without recommendation and rerefer to the Committee on Education. | |
2011-04-25 | Exemption effective. | |
2011-04-25 | To committee. | |
2011-04-25 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . | |
2011-04-22 | To printer. | |
2011-04-22 | Rereferred to Committee on Finance. | |
2011-04-22 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 294.) | |
2011-04-22 | Notice of eligibility for exemption. | |
2011-04-20 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-03-02 | From printer. To committee. | |
2011-03-01 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |