NV SB210 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-05 - No further consideration.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-05 - No further consideration.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to governmental administration; declaring that the public policy of the State of Nevada includes that persons appointed to certain public bodies by the Governor should reflect the diversity of the State; requiring certain public bodies to submit lists of qualified persons to the Governor to fill vacancies on a board, commission or similar body within 60 days after the vacancy occurs; revising the manner in which the Chair and Vice Chair of the Sunset Subcommittee of the Legislative Commission are selected; modifying reporting requirements by certain licensing boards and other regulatory bodies concerning the criminal histories of certain applicants; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing state boards and commissions. (BDR 18-899)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-05 | Senate | No further consideration. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Made Special Order of Business for June 5, 2023, at 11:15 A.M. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor. Returned to Senate with Governor's veto message. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 27, Nays: 14, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2023-05-19 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2023-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2023-05-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 16, Nays: 4, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Read second time. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |