NV SB21 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-18 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-18 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to cybersecurity; enacting the Insurance Data Security Law; requiring certain licensees with licenses or other authorizations related to the provision and administration of insurance to develop, implement and maintain an information security program that meets certain requirements; establishing requirements for the selection and oversight of third-party service providers by such licensees; requiring certain insurers to submit to the Commissioner of Insurance an annual statement certifying their compliance with certain cybersecurity requirements; enacting provisions governing the response of certain licensees to a cybersecurity event; authorizing the Commissioner to investigate and take disciplinary action against licensees for violations of certain cybersecurity requirements; making certain information obtained by the Commissioner confidential and privileged; providing penalties; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Enacts the Insurance Data Security Law. (BDR 57-221)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-18 | Assembly | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.) |
2019-04-19 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. |
2019-04-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 13, Nays: 8.) To Assembly. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 320.) To printer. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read first time. To committee. |
2018-11-19 | Senate | From printer. |
2018-11-15 | Senate | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |