NV SB208 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Chapter 212. (Effective July 1, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Chapter 212. (Effective July 1, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to local governments; requiring the governing body of a county or city to enact ordinances relating to battery-charged fences; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Requires counties and cities to enact certain ordinances relating to battery-charged fences. (BDR 20-853)
Sponsors
Sen. Edgar Flores [D] | Sen. Jeff Stone [R] | Sen. Pete Goicoechea [R] | Sen. Richard Daly [D] |
Sen. Lisa Krasner [R] | Sen. James Ohrenschall [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-07 | Senate | Chapter 212. (Effective July 1, 2023) |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 626 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | In Senate. |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 626.) To printer. |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-04-20 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2023-04-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) To Assembly. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 160.) To printer. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |