NV SB208 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-15 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-15 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to health care. (BDR 57-24)
Title
Revises provisions relating to health care. (BDR 57-24)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-15 | Senate | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.) |
2017-02-28 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer. |