NV SB203 | 2013 | 77th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires legislative lobbyists to file quarterly reports concerning lobbying activities under certain circumstances. (BDR 17-26)
Title
Requires legislative lobbyists to file quarterly reports concerning lobbying activities under certain circumstances. (BDR 17-26)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-04 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2013-04-09 | Assembly | EXEMPT, Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule 14.6.4(a). |
2013-03-27 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee. |
2013-03-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Read second time. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2013-03-04 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer. |