NV SB198 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 33.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 33.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Extends the deadline for issuing certain bonds relating to the property and natural resources of Nevada approved by the voters in 2002. (BDR S-494)
Title
Extends the deadline for issuing certain bonds relating to the property and natural resources of Nevada approved by the voters in 2002. (BDR S-494)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 33. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 3.) To Senate. |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2017-04-04 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2017-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Read second time. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |