NV SB193 | 2011 | 76th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Chapter 482.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Chapter 482.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Makes various changes concerning the State Board of Cosmetology and persons and practices regulated by the Board. (BDR 54-637)
Title
Makes various changes concerning the State Board of Cosmetology and persons and practices regulated by the Board. (BDR 54-637)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Chapter 482. | |
2011-06-16 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-06-16 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2011-06-08 | To enrollment. | |
2011-06-08 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint . | |
2011-06-06 | To printer. | |
2011-06-06 | Conference report adopted by Assembly. | |
2011-06-05 | Conference report adopted by Senate. | |
2011-06-05 | From committee: Concur in Assembly Amendment No. 568 and further amend. | |
2011-05-29 | Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee. | |
2011-05-29 | In Senate. | |
2011-05-28 | Assembly Amendment No. 568 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To Senate. | |
2011-05-26 | In Assembly. | |
2011-05-25 | Assembly Amendment No. 568 not concurred in. To Assembly. | |
2011-05-14 | In Senate. | |
2011-05-13 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate. | |
2011-05-12 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . | |
2011-05-11 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 568.) To printer. | |
2011-05-11 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2011-05-11 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-03-22 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. | |
2011-03-22 | In Assembly. | |
2011-03-21 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2011-03-18 | Read second time. | |
2011-03-17 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2011-02-25 | From printer. To committee. | |
2011-02-24 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer. |