NV SB186 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 277.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 277.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to physical therapy; enacting and entering into the Physical Therapy Licensure Compact; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Enacts provisions governing the interstate practice of physical therapy. (BDR 54-514)
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-01 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 277. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Assembly Amendment Nos. 864 and 968 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-05-27 | Assembly | To Senate. |
2019-05-27 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | To printer. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Dispensed with reprinting. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 968.) |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 864.) To printer. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-04-16 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. |
2019-04-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 86.) To printer. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |