NV SB183 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to governmental administration; revising certain requirements for public notice of meetings of public bodies; requiring the minutes of meetings of public bodies include a detailed summary of certain matters; revising requirements related to the small business impact statements prepared by state agencies for administrative regulations; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Makes various changes relating to governmental administration. (BDR 19-537)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | Senate | (No further action taken.) |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Taken from General File. Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/80th2019/Bill/6311/Overview |
Text | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/80th2019/Bills/SB/SB183.pdf |