NV SB180 | 2011 | 76th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-25 - Read third time. Lost. (Yeas: 10, Nays: 11.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Expands provisions governing criminal and civil liability for certain crimes to include crimes motivated by the victim's gender identity or expression. (BDR 15-414)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expands provisions governing criminal and civil liability for certain crimes to include crimes motivated by the victim's gender identity or expression. (BDR 15-414)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 10 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-25 Read third time. Lost. (Yeas: 10, Nays: 11.)
2011-04-22 Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2011-04-20 Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2011-04-19 Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2011-04-18 Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2011-04-15 Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2011-04-15 From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2011-04-14 Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 77.) To printer.
2011-04-11 From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2011-02-18 From printer. To committee.
2011-02-17 Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback