NV SB174 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Renames McCarran International Airport as Harry Reid International Airport. (BDR S-34)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Renames McCarran International Airport as Harry Reid International Airport. (BDR S-34)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-06Senate(No further action taken.)
2017-04-13SenateWaiver granted effective: April 13, 2017.
2017-02-15SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2017-02-13SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.
2017-02-13SenatePrefiled.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback