NV SB17 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-16 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-16 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes a deputy director of the Department of Corrections to accept part-time employment as an instructor at an institution of higher education. (BDR 16-339)
Title
Authorizes a deputy director of the Department of Corrections to accept part-time employment as an instructor at an institution of higher education. (BDR 16-339)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-16 | Assembly | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.) |
2015-04-03 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2015-04-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 47.) To printer. |
2015-03-30 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Read first time. To committee. |
2014-12-22 | Senate | From printer. |
2014-12-20 | Senate | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |