NV SB167 | 2013 | 77th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 149.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Enacts provisions for the designation of certain hospitals as STEMI receiving centers. (BDR 40-229)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts provisions for the designation of certain hospitals as STEMI receiving centers. (BDR 40-229)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-24SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 149.
2013-05-24SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2013-05-21SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2013-05-20AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 3.) To Senate.
2013-05-18AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2013-05-17AssemblyRead second time.
2013-05-17AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2013-05-17AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2013-04-16AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
2013-04-16AssemblyIn Assembly.
2013-04-15SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2013-04-12SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2013-04-11SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2013-04-10SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 129.) To printer.
2013-04-09SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2013-02-20SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2013-02-19SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback