NV SB166 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a pilot program to survey pupils enrolled in public schools concerning the use and abuse of tobacco, alcohol, prescription drugs and controlled substances. (BDR S-795)
Title
Establishes a pilot program to survey pupils enrolled in public schools concerning the use and abuse of tobacco, alcohol, prescription drugs and controlled substances. (BDR S-795)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | Senate | (No further action taken.) |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 241.) |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and re-refer to Committee on Finance. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Prefiled. |