NV SB163 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-13 - Chapter 376. (Effective July 1, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-13 - Chapter 376. (Effective July 1, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to insurance; requiring certain health insurance to include coverage for the treatment of conditions relating to gender dysphoria and gender incongruence; prohibiting such insurers from engaging in certain discrimination on the basis of gender identity or expression; making appropriations and authorizing certain expenditures; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Requires certain health insurance to cover treatment of certain conditions relating to gender dysphoria and gender incongruence. (BDR 57-129)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-02 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-02 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-13 | Senate | Chapter 376. (Effective July 1, 2023) |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2023-06-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 26, Nays: 14, Excused: 2.) To Senate. |
2023-06-03 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2023-06-03 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-06-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2023-06-03 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. |
2023-06-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2023-06-03 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. To Assembly. |
2023-06-02 | Senate | To printer. |
2023-06-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 13, Nays: 8.) |
2023-06-02 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2023-06-02 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 853.) |
2023-06-02 | Senate | Placed on General File. |
2023-06-02 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. Exemption effective. To printer. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 312.) Taken from General File. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |