NV SB162 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 474.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to electronic transactions; including a public blockchain as a type of electronic record for the purposes of the Uniform Electronic Transactions Act; providing that a person who uses a public blockchain to secure information does not relinquish any right of ownership related to that information; requiring a governmental agency to consider certain uses of its equipment and software in acquiring, replacing or updating an information processing system; requiring a governmental agency to accept a certified copy of a record in electronic form under certain circumstances; authorizing a governmental agency to charge and collect certain fees relating to a certified copy of a record in electronic form; prohibiting a local government from taxing or imposing restrictions upon the use of a public blockchain; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to electronic transactions. (BDR 59-876)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-01 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10SenateChapter 474.
2019-06-07SenateApproved by the Governor.
2019-06-06SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-06-03SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2019-06-03AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 38, Nays: 3, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
2019-06-03AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2019-06-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-06-01AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2019-06-01AssemblyIn Assembly.
2019-06-01SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2019-06-01SenatePlaced on General File.
2019-06-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended.
2019-04-19SenateExemption effective.
2019-04-19SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
2019-04-18SenateRe-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
2019-04-18SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 294.)
2019-04-18SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-04-18SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-03-18SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2019-02-15SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2019-02-14SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback