NV SB151 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Chapter 600.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to property; removing and revising certain provisions relating to actions for summary eviction; reorganizing procedures for summary eviction of a tenant of a commercial premise; revising provisions governing notices to surrender possession of real property or a mobile home; limiting the amount of fees for the late payment of rent; requiring a landlord to allow a former tenant to retrieve essential personal effects and establishing an expedited procedure if a landlord acts unreasonably under such circumstances; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions related to certain proceedings concerning property. (BDR 3-516)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-13SenateChapter 600.
2019-06-12SenateApproved by the Governor.
2019-06-07SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-06-05SenateTo enrollment.
2019-06-04SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Fifth reprint.
2019-06-04SenateTo printer.
2019-06-03Senate(Conference Amend. No. CA6.)
2019-06-03SenateConference report adopted by Assembly.
2019-06-03SenateConference report adopted by Senate.
2019-06-03SenateFrom committee: Concur in Assembly Amendment Nos. 780 and 850 and further amend.
2019-06-03SenateConference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee.
2019-06-03SenateIn Senate.
2019-06-02AssemblyAssembly Amendment Nos. 780 and 850 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To Senate.
2019-06-02AssemblyIn Assembly.
2019-06-02SenateAssembly Amendment Nos. 780 and 850 not concurred in. To Assembly.
2019-05-24SenateIn Senate.
2019-05-23AssemblyTo Senate.
2019-05-23AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Fourth reprint.
2019-05-23AssemblyTo printer.
2019-05-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 12, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.)
2019-05-23AssemblyDispensed with reprinting.
2019-05-23AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 850.)
2019-05-23AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint.
2019-05-22AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 780.) To printer.
2019-05-22AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-05-22AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-04-25AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2019-04-25AssemblyIn Assembly.
2019-04-23SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. To Assembly.
2019-04-23SenateTo printer.
2019-04-23SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 13, Nays: 8.)
2019-04-23SenateReprinting dispensed with.
2019-04-23SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 635.)
2019-04-23SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-22SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 77.) To printer.
2019-04-22SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-04-22SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-02-13SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2019-02-12SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/80th2019/Bill/6188/Overview
Texthttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/80th2019/Bills/SB/SB151.pdf
Texthttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/80th2019/Bills/SB/SB151_R1.pdf
Texthttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/80th2019/Bills/SB/SB151_R2.pdf
Texthttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/80th2019/Bills/SB/SB151_R3.pdf
Texthttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/80th2019/Bills/SB/SB151_R4.pdf
Texthttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/80th2019/Bills/SB/SB151_R5.pdf
Texthttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/80th2019/Bills/SB/SB151_EN.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/80th2019/Bill/GetBillVoteMembers?voteKey=5965&voteResultPanel=All
Roll Callhttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/80th2019/Bill/GetBillVoteMembers?voteKey=6277&voteResultPanel=All

Bill Comments

feedback