NV SB151 | 2011 | 76th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-15 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 390.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-15 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 390.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires certain governmental entities to develop a plan for a regional rapid transit system. (BDR22-612)
Title
Requires certain governmental entities to develop a plan for a regional rapid transit system. (BDR22-612)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-15 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 390. | |
2011-06-06 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2011-06-04 | Assembly Amendment No. 648 concurred in. To enrollment. | |
2011-06-02 | In Senate. | |
2011-05-30 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. | |
2011-05-30 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint . | |
2011-05-29 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 648.) To printer. | |
2011-05-29 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2011-05-29 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-04-27 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. | |
2011-04-27 | In Assembly. | |
2011-04-27 | To Assembly. | |
2011-04-27 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . | |
2011-04-26 | To printer. | |
2011-04-26 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) | |
2011-04-26 | Placed on General File. | |
2011-04-26 | Reprinting dispensed with. | |
2011-04-26 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 467.) | |
2011-04-26 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2011-04-26 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-04-04 | Notice of eligibility for exemption. | |
2011-02-17 | From printer. To committee. | |
2011-02-16 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer. |