NV SB150 | 2011 | 76th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-13 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 327.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-13 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 327.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises certain provisions governing liens of owners of facilities for storage. (BDR 9-907)
Title
Revises certain provisions governing liens of owners of facilities for storage. (BDR 9-907)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-13 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 327. | |
2011-06-06 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2011-06-04 | Assembly Amendment No. 734 concurred in. To enrollment. | |
2011-05-30 | In Senate. | |
2011-05-29 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. | |
2011-05-28 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2011-05-28 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint . | |
2011-05-27 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 734.) To printer. | |
2011-05-27 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2011-05-27 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-04-27 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. | |
2011-04-27 | In Assembly. | |
2011-04-26 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 13, Nays: 8.) To Assembly. | |
2011-04-26 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . | |
2011-04-25 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 480.) To printer. | |
2011-04-22 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-02-17 | From printer. To committee. | |
2011-02-16 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |