NV SB141 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Chapter 165.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Chapter 165.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public works; revising provisions relating to the scope of horizontal construction and vertical construction for certain purposes; removing the prospective expiration of provisions relating to construction managers at risk; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to public works. (BDR 28-44)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-28 | Senate | Chapter 165. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Absent: 1.) To Senate. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-04-16 | Assembly | Rereferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. |
2021-04-16 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 47.) To printer. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |