NV SB135 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Chapter 590.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to state employees; authorizing collective bargaining for certain state employees; renaming and expanding the duties of the Local Government Employee-Management Relations Board; providing for bargaining units of state employees and their representatives; establishing procedures for collective bargaining and for making and amending collective bargaining agreements; prohibiting certain unfair labor practices; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for collective bargaining by state employees. (BDR 23-650)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2019-06-01 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-13SenateChapter 590.
2019-06-12SenateApproved by the Governor.
2019-06-06SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-06-03SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2019-06-02AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 13, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
2019-06-02AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2019-06-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-06-02AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.
2019-06-02AssemblyIn Assembly.
2019-06-01SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. To Assembly.
2019-06-01SenateTo printer.
2019-06-01SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 13, Nays: 8.)
2019-06-01SenateReprinting dispensed with.
2019-06-01SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1077.)
2019-06-01SenatePlaced on General File.
2019-06-01SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-04-18SenateExemption effective.
2019-04-18SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
2019-04-17SenateRe-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
2019-04-17SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 260.)
2019-04-17SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-04-17SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-03-18SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2019-02-08SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2019-02-07SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback