NV SB129 | 2015 | 78th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-27 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 264.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Limits civil liability of certain persons for injuries or death resulting from certain equine activities. (BDR 3-611)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Limits civil liability of certain persons for injuries or death resulting from certain equine activities. (BDR 3-611)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-27SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 264.
2015-05-26SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2015-05-22SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2015-05-21AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2015-05-20AssemblyRead second time.
2015-05-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2015-04-10AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2015-04-10AssemblyIn Assembly.
2015-04-08SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2015-04-08SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2015-04-07SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 68.) To printer.
2015-04-06SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2015-02-10SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2015-02-09SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback